Financial history ST MICHAEL'S TRUST

Charity number: 298806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.50k £17.68k £18.52k £14.15k £19.85k
Total expenditure £26.26k £25.47k £25.21k £17.85k £17.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A