Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE CHURCH BEDFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity number: 299289
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 June 2021 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 20 April 2020 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 February 2019 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 September 2018 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 21 February 2019 381 days late Download Open in new window