Financial history ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 299362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £64.10k £38.72k £67.82k £66.25k £60.43k
Total expenditure £53.80k £61.72k £69.73k £43.80k £64.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A