CASSL

Charity number: 299665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time Download