FRIENDS OF ST PETERS CHURCH

Charity number: 299807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Theresa Mary Pratt Trustee 13 June 2018
THE ANGLICAN CENTRAL NAVAL CHURCH FUND (ACNCF) Received: On time
Brenda Elaine Robinson Trustee 29 June 2017 None on record
David Michael Page Trustee 18 March 2021 None on record
Lord David Charles Poole Trustee 23 June 2016 None on record
PAUL ROBERT EMMERSON Trustee 24 September 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BISHOP'S WALTHAM Received: On time
MEON VALLEY CARERS GROUP Received: On time
BISHOP'S WALTHAM EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE Received: On time
SYLVIA MARGARET DICKENSON Trustee 06 May 2011 None on record
Lady Kate Helen Poole Trustee 23 June 2016 None on record
Tamsin Jane Withers Trustee 13 June 2018 None on record