Accounts and annual returns SEEKPORT LTD

Charity number: 299870
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 August 2021 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 12 August 2021 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 March 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 29 March 2020 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 March 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 15 March 2019 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 08 March 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 08 March 2018 8 days late Download Open in new window