Financial history SEEKPORT LTD

Charity number: 299870
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £38.27k £171.27k £46.26k £44.82k £56.56k
Total expenditure £22.80k £315.30k £39.31k £35.88k £48.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A