AURORA OPTIONS

Charity number: 299935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.06m £4.21m £4.23m £3.98m £3.79m
Total expenditure £4.03m £4.21m £4.22m £3.97m £3.69m
Income from government contracts £4.03m £2.57m £4.19m N/A £2.78m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £139.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £30.81k £37.83k £34.63k £21.78k £5.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.03m £4.17m £4.19m £3.96m £3.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £139.43k
Income - Legacies £30.81k £0 £0 £0 £5.27k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.03m £4.21m £4.22m £3.97m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £287.45k £0 £0 £0 £289.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0