Accounts and annual returns THE DOVER SOCIETY

Charity number: 299954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window