Financial history THE DOVER SOCIETY

Charity number: 299954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.76k £14.50k £22.21k £12.88k £5.37k
Total expenditure £61.08k £9.51k £27.58k £13.18k £8.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A