THE DAIWA ANGLO-JAPANESE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 299955
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £407.15k £390.95k £428.25k £323.64k £467.90k
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.32m £1.52m £1.60m £1.61m