THE DAIWA ANGLO-JAPANESE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 299955
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jessie Angelica Turnbull Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
Yusuke Kawamura Trustee 10 January 2014 None on record
Stephen Barber Trustee 01 July 2015 None on record
Ms Yoko Dochi Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
Professor Richard Bowring Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
PAUL DIMOND CMG Trustee 10 January 2014 None on record
Masaki Orita Trustee 10 January 2014 None on record
Takashi Hibino Trustee 21 June 2018 None on record
Dr SACHIKO KUSUKAWA Trustee 21 June 2018
JOHN RAY CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Sir Tim Hitchens Chair 21 June 2018
WOLFSON COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Charity reporting is up to date
James Paul Harding Trustee 29 June 2017
FULL FACT Charity reporting is up to date
Professor Hirotaka Takeuchi Trustee 14 October 2014 None on record