LATIN AMERICAN WOMEN'S AID REFUGE

Charity number: 299975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £372.26k £285.97k £489.11k £656.95k £881.92k
Total expenditure £264.71k £327.17k £336.45k £464.39k £694.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £24.63k N/A £19.00k
Income from government grants £72.35k £61.78k N/A £199.91k £147.16k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £5.97k £45.17k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £646.85k £836.75k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4.14k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £463.84k £694.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £552 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0