LATIN AMERICAN WOMEN'S AID REFUGE

Charity number: 299975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claudia Marcela Pari Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Laura Lopez Pulido Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Stefania Alvarez Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record
Patricia Bonifaz Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Jillian Fitzgerald Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record