Trustees BLISLAND VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300039

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leonard John Croney | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||
KAREN MARY WYLDS | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINNET TEASDALE | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Irons | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathrine Isobel Vause | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ron Wilson | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Bibb | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edith Caroline Carey | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RICK CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENDOLINE MARY POPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.