Accounts and annual returns DORNEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2019 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required