Financial history DORNEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £23.77k £24.85k £27.17k £29.25k £16.11k
Total expenditure £12.77k £17.74k £15.08k £25.16k £11.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £400 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £11.90k