Accounts and annual returns WEST WYCOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window