DRY DRAYTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required