Financial history CARNON DOWNS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £39.52k £37.25k £36.65k £23.87k £18.63k
Total expenditure £49.26k £28.66k £23.91k £16.51k £3.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.33k £16.26k