Accounts and annual returns WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 300589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 22 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 08 January 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 08 January 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window