Financial history WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 300589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £27.62k £34.76k £30.90k £40.27k £28.69k
Total expenditure £16.96k £39.32k £34.54k £32.74k £29.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £17.34k