CHALFONT ST PETER GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.62k £3.71k £1.61k £3.48k £1
Total expenditure £2.36k £2.54k £2.34k £2.75k £2.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A