AYLESBEARE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Jonathon Branson Trustee 08 October 2021 None on record
Andrew Martin Bennett Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
DAVID BARCLAY WILLIAMSON Trustee 01 November 2020
UNSIGNED TRUST Overdue by 216 days
Oxygen House Foundation Received: On time
TANSI PAULINE ASH Trustee 14 June 2012 None on record
Mrs Ro Dickman Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
KATHERINE CROMPTON Trustee
AYLESBEARE WOMENS INSTITUTE Received: On time
Fiona Incoll Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
Joanna Ash Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
Frances HAWKINS Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
Nicolas Robin Warren Trustee 08 October 2021 None on record