Financial history 1ST SHELFORDS AND STAPLEFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 301093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.80k £15.67k £15.10k £14.78k £6.38k
Total expenditure £13.45k £13.89k £16.77k £13.80k £5.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A