GILLINGHAM SWIMMING BATH

Charity number: 301131
Charity reporting is overdue by 1824 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 729 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 729 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1824 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1824 days