Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required