Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.01k £5.80k £5.07k £5.38k £1.93k
Total expenditure £3.47k £2.56k £6.65k £5.20k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A