Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.85k £14.38k £19.30k £14.17k £11.17k
Total expenditure £18.44k £8.81k £19.19k £7.11k £8.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.14k N/A N/A £10.00k £2.68k