CINDERFORD WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 301498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £73.03k £39.06k £41.25k £43.42k £31.15k
Total expenditure £70.83k £40.73k £36.52k £44.38k £28.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A