Accounts and annual returns OAKRIDGE WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301733
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 January 2022 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 March 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2021 515 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window