COPYTHORNE PARISH HALL

Charity number: 301790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Dovey Trustee 30 September 2018
COPYTHORNE PRESCHOOL PLAYGROUP Received: On time
Sandra Soffe Trustee 04 October 2010 None on record
Martin John Lander Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
OWEN MILLS Chair 04 October 2010 None on record
BARBARA DOROTHY MAY SMITH Trustee 04 October 2010 None on record
Graham Chillcott Trustee 27 June 2021 None on record
GRAHAM DOUGLAS PEARSON Trustee None on record
Simon Lucas Trustee 02 July 2018 None on record
Rosina Brandham Trustee 05 September 2016 None on record