CHARITY CONSISTING OF CERTAIN TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH PORTSEA ROTARY YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 301922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £1.06k £833 £670 £50 £249
Total expenditure £3.58k £2.96k £23.01k £12.95k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A