Financial history THE COLONEL JENKINS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301985
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £1.12k £1.38k £927 £995
Total expenditure £1.33k £1.33k £1.51k £1.60k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A