2ND COWES (ST MARY'S) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 March 2021 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 March 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required