1ST HORNDEAN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302250
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kelly Chidwick Trustee 22 May 2017 None on record
ADRIAN JUDGE Chair 03 July 2017 None on record
Jane Edwards Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Richard Smith Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
JANE ROWNEY Trustee None on record
ROBERT CHIDWICK Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record
Gail June Beresford Trustee 06 October 2013 None on record
Jacqueline Byatt Trustee 21 May 2014 None on record