Financial history 1ST KNEBWORTH-EARL OF LYTTON'S OWN- SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.09k £18.65k £51.41k £16.16k £20.95k
Total expenditure £20.04k £15.79k £50.92k £17.22k £18.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £32.00k N/A £10.00k