Trustees 1ST KNEBWORTH-EARL OF LYTTON'S OWN- SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Susan Lilian Parkins Chair 21 January 2021
None on record
Rosemary Dorothy Conybeare Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Siobhann McKechnie Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Kevin Howard Burr Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Hammond Ward Trustee 10 February 2021
None on record
Lisa Jane Geary Trustee 10 February 2021
None on record
Jason David Baxter Trustee 21 January 2021
None on record
Lisa Dana Sternfeldt Trustee 19 January 2017
HITCHIN GIRLS FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Steven Prentice Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
CAROLINE HIGGINS Trustee 31 January 2014
None on record
Steven Franklin Palacio Trustee
None on record
Linda Jean Brookes Trustee
None on record
Amanda Jane Aldridge Trustee
None on record