Financial history 5TH POTTERS BAR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.95k £46.05k £39.28k £40.86k £15.77k
Total expenditure £19.64k £40.77k £34.64k £34.28k £22.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A