Trustees 5TH POTTERS BAR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James Day Trustee 28 July 2020
None on record
Mark Trollope Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
David Nigel Sanderson Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
Michele Pendrell-Smith Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
James Samuel David Sanderson Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
Daniel David Glynne Thomas Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
MARTIN ADAMS Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Nicola Helen Durrant Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Alison Young Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record
CHRIS BRUNNING Trustee
None on record
ALEX MILLER Trustee
None on record