WARESLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 17 January 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required