WARESLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.66k £4.27k £4.47k £5.93k £2.85k
Total expenditure £1.65k £1.40k £4.05k £7.41k £22.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A