Accounts and annual returns WEST THORNTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 302991
Charity reporting is overdue by 659 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 294 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 294 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 659 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 659 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 November 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 November 2020 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 November 2020 518 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 November 2020 518 days late Download Open in new window