Financial history WEST THORNTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 302991
Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £45.78k £47.07k £52.44k £56.64k £54.21k
Total expenditure £49.69k £46.17k £51.71k £53.65k £51.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k N/A £15.00k £25.00k