THE HOLLYCOMBE WORKING STEAM MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1061693
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 02 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 02 December 2016 On time Download