THE HOLLYCOMBE WORKING STEAM MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1061693
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £230.67k £247.16k £294.51k £427.21k £395.08k
Total expenditure £221.98k £245.10k £247.18k £306.42k £389.79k