Trustees WIMBLEDON AND PUTNEY COMMONS CONSERVATORS

Charity number: 303167
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANE KATHRYN NEIL MILLS Chair 04 April 2018
None on record
Susan Bucknall Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Michael Frederick Johnston Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
OLIVER BENNETT MBE Trustee 02 February 2021
None on record
David Hince Trustee 04 April 2018
ST. TERESA'S HOME CIO
Received: On time
PETER DENIS HIRSCH Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record
NIGEL DIGBY WARE Trustee 15 March 2018
None on record
MICHAEL STEPHEN JOHN RAPPOLT Trustee 01 May 2017
ST GEORGE'S HOSPITAL CHARITY
Received: On time