Financial history PUBLOW AND PENSFORD MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1065797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.80k £31.84k £23.55k £8.91k £1.29k
Total expenditure £22.74k £18.18k £28.47k £10.63k £7.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.00k £4.82k N/A N/A