Financial history 5TH SHEPPEY (EASTCHURCH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.66k £14.78k £11.12k £26.96k £18.15k
Total expenditure £14.65k £13.64k £9.04k £21.17k £12.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.63k £1.60k £1.05k £400 £10.00k