21ST HENDON (3RD MILL HILL) GROUP BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 303491
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 February 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 February 2021 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required